Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWillamette Riverkeeper v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityEugene
Case Number6:2020cv02189
Date Filed2020-12-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ann L. Aiken
PlaintiffWillamette Riverkeeper an Oregon non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Willamette Riverkeeper submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning six categories relating to the assessment of the Willamette Valley project dams. Willamette Riverkeeper also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Willamette Riverkeeper repeatedly contacted the agency to check on the status of its request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willamette Riverkeeper filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-161First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7644381 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Willamette Riverkeeper against Army Corps of Engineers (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Willamette Riverkeeper's FOIA Request, # 2 Attachment Corps' Draft Environmental Assessment, # 3 Attachment Corps' FOIA Acknowledgement, # 4 Attachment Parties' Email Exchanges, # 5 Attachment Willamette Riverkeeper Notice of Violation to Corps, # 6 Attachment Corps' Response, # 7 Attachment Civil Action Cover Sheet). (Holmes, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-162First Proposed Summons to US Army Corps of Engineers Filed by Willamette Riverkeeper. (Holmes, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-163First Corporate Disclosure Statement of Willamette Riverkeeper . Filed by Willamette Riverkeeper. (Holmes, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-164Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/17/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 5/17/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-165Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Army Corps of Engineers. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-176CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/17/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-157Notice of Appearance of Joshua Keller appearing on behalf of United States Army Corps of Engineers Filed by on behalf of United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Keller, Joshua) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-158Affidavit of Service of Proposed Summons 2 , Summons Issued, 5 upon United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 12/17/2020 Filed by Willamette Riverkeeper. (Holmes, Elisabeth) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-199Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, 1 . Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Keller, Joshua) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-2010ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 9 . Answer is due by 2/10/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar