Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS Right to Know v. United States Department of Education
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv09117
Date Filed2020-12-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffUS Right to Know
Case DescriptionUS Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning a request for records from the agency to the University of Texas. USRTK also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, USRTK filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-171COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15335185.). Filed byUS Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-172Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-173Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-174Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-175Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) Modified on 12/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-176Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-187Summons Issued as to United States Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-188Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-309CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Right to Know.. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-3010SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. All Defendants. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-2211ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of Education. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-2212CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-02-0513CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Education.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-1814STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Exempting Parties from Rule 26 Requirements filed by United States Department of Education, US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-1915ORDER (AS MODIFIED) GRANTING 14 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASEMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXEMPT PARTIES FROM RULE 26 REQUIREMENTS: Parties shall file joint Case Management Statement by 4/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM is continued to 4/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that ph otographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Motions terminated: 14 Stipulation and proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/19/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-2316Certificate of Interested Entities by US Right to Know (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-2317ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-24Electronic filing error . Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings (4:20- cv-09117-DMR). Re: 16 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by US Right to Know, 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by US Right to Know. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-04-0818MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Daniel C. Snyder (Filing fee $317, receipt number 0971-15812161) filed by US Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-0819ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 18 Daniel C. Snyder's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-1320STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Case Management and FOIA Record Production filed by United States Department of Education, US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-1521ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Stipulation Regarding Case Management and FOIA Record Production 20 be entered as an Order of the court. Court will hold an initial case management conference on 9/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Parties shall file a joint case management conference statement by 9/8/2021. Either party may request an earlier case management conference pursuant to paragraph 4 of the Stipulation. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)
2021-09-0322STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 9/3/2021) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-0723ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 22 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/7/21. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021). Modified on 9/7/2021 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar