Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03730
Date Filed2020-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning materials prepared by agency official Chip Laitinen pertaining to the meeting between former Ambassador to Ukraine Yovanovitch and Karen Tramontano of Blue Star Strategies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Citizens United that unusual circumstances applied to the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7976823) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Summons to State Dept, # 6 Summons to US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-18Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-314NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar