Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Consumer Law Center v. Saul
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2020cv12253
Date Filed2020-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark L. Wolf
PlaintiffNational Consumer Law Center
Case DescriptionThe National Consumer Law Center submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning the agency's use of Lexis-Nexis. NCLC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied NCLC's request for a fee waiver. NCLC filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied NCC's appeal. The agency sent an interim response containing five pages and indicated it had withheld records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). The agency told NCLC that it would provide a subsequent release but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NCLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAndrew M. Saul Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-181COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8559736 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Rossman, Stuart) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-182ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-183Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-214Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 3/18/2021. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar