Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHAND v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03690
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJEHU HAND
Case DescriptionJehu Hand submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his conviction for stock fraud. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hand filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/14/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JEHU HAND.(zsb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEHU HAND (Attachment: # 1 Declaration)(zsb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17***Staff notes: A copy of the Docket Sheet was mailed to the pro se party at the address of record. (zmd) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-173PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-284NOTICE of Change of Address by JEHU HAND (zsb) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-285Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to JEHU HAND; Type of Document Returned: Docket Sheet.; Resent at New Address: HERLONG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 800 HERLONG, CA 96113. (zsb) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-086NOTICE of Change of Address by JEHU HAND (zsb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-087PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JEHU HAND (zsb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar