Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHAND v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03691
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJEHU HAND
Case DescriptionJehu Hand submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his conviction for stock fraud. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hand filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/14/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-141COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed by JEHU HAND.(adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEHU HAND (Attachment: # 1 Declaration)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-173PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-284NOTICE of Change of Address by JEHU HAND (zsb) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar