Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHAND v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03692
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJEHU HAND
Case DescriptionJehu Hand, who had been convicted of stock fraud, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning his incarceration, among other topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hand filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/14/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by JEHU HAND.(adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEHU HAND (Attachment: # 1 Declaration)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-173PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-284NOTICE of Change of Address by JEHU HAND (zsb) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar