Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHicks v. SSA
DistrictEastern District of Kentucky
CityPikeville
Case Number7:2020cv00157
Date Filed2020-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William O. Bertelsman
PlaintiffH. David Hicks Electronic Filing Granted DE #10
Case DescriptionDavid Hicks submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided records with redactions. Hicks filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its initial decision on appeal. Hicks then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemptions

DefendantCommissioner of SSA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-191COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4855700), filed by H. David Hicks pro se . (Attachments: # 1 USM 285) (TDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-21Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-213STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2016. (TDA) cc: H. David Hicks by US Mail (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-214IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: # 1 Sample Caption Page) (TDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-21NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO H. David Hicks re 1 Complaint: attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 20-99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days . cc: COR (TDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-21***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: 1 Complaint. (TDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-235ORDER: 1. In order for this matter to proceed, Hicks must comply with this district's Local Rules and FRCP, including Rule 4's provisions regarding service on dft. 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b), this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, including preparing proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on any dispositive motions. 3. Clerk shall assign this matter to a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 12/23/2020. (RCB)cc: COR and H. David Hicks by US Mail (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Atkins for review: 5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (RCB) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-317MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by H. David Hicks. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Henry) Modified event & text on 1/4/2021 (TDA). (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-318PROPOSED SUMMONSES by H. David Hicks (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Hicks, Henry) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (TDA). (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-319Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and returned electronically to counsel . (TDA) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-0710ORDER: Plaintiff's motion (R. 7 ) is GRANTED and he shall be permitted to file electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 1/7/2021. (TDA) cc: COR (Entered: 01/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar