Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHooker v. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2020cv02994
Date Filed2020-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Charlene Edwards Honeywell
PlaintiffCarlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
DefendantCarlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
DefendantDepartment of Veteran Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-211COMPLAINT against Department of Veteran Affairs filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons)(JLD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-212MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-243RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/24/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 12/24/2020)
2020-12-244INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/24/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 12/24/2020)
2021-01-075NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): yes. (CRH) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-076CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Interested persons order by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (CRH) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-077REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.; recommending that the motion be denied and that the plaintiff's complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/6/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar