Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER, LLC v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03787
Date Filed2020-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER, LLC
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7989578) filed by ella Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-222CIVIL COVER SHEET by ella Louise Trauma Center LLC re 1 Complaint, filed by ella Louise Trauma Center LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ella Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-22Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-223SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2021. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/28/20. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCMENT served on 12/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar