Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHoffmann v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2020cv06427
Date Filed2020-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY
PlaintiffKaren L. Hoffmann
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-221COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14799880.), filed by Karen L. Hoffmann. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form)(HOFFMANN, KAREN) Modified on 12/22/2020 (fb). (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-23Summons Issued as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/23/2020. SUMMONS ISSUED TO AUSA ON 12/23/2020. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-282Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar