Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03806
Date Filed2020-12-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-231COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7996105) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Summons BLM, # 15 Summons USAO, # 16 Summons USAG)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-292CIVIL COVERT SHEET ERRATA by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-044STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 4, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-125NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar