Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleE.O.C. Ord, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv09343
Date Filed2020-12-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Maxine M. Chesney
PlaintiffE.O.C. Ord, Inc. A Professional Corporation
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-241VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DELARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT AND THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT (No Process) against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15366160). Filed by E.O.C. Ord, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ord, Edward) (Filed on 12/24/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/24/2020)
2020-12-242Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/7/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020) (Entered: 12/26/2020)
2020-12-283Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons proposed summons to AG for North Cal., # 2 Summons proposed summons to AG for U.S.)(Ord, Edward) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-294Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-305Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-086CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E.O.C. Ord, Inc... (Ord, Edward) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-117CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-128ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/12/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-149CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E.O.C. Ord, Inc. of Complaint and Summons on Commissioner or Internal Revenue (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service for U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service for AG for N.D. Cal)(Ord, Edward) (Filed on 1/14/2021) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-1510***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 11 *** CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/15/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/15/2021 (tlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1511CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/15/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2021) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1612AFFIDAVIT of Service for CMC order and Standing Order served on Elisabeth M. Bruce, Trial Attorney United States Department of Justice on 1/16/2021, filed by E.O.C. Ord, Inc.., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by E.O.C. Ord, Inc. re 11 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ord, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2021) (Entered: 01/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar