Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleE.O.C. Ord, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv09343
Date Filed2020-12-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffE.O.C. Ord, Inc.
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-241COMPLAINT (No Process) against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15366160.). Filed byE.O.C. Ord, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ord, Edward) (Filed on 12/24/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/24/2020)
2020-12-242Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/7/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020) (Entered: 12/26/2020)
2020-12-283Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons proposed summons to AG for North Cal., # 2 Summons proposed summons to AG for U.S.)(Ord, Edward) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-294Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-305Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-086CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E.O.C. Ord, Inc... (Ord, Edward) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar