Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03827
Date Filed2020-12-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffNOAH SHACHTMAN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Daily Beast Editor Noah Shachtman submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the agency's decision to recognize Joe Biden as president-elect. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP and Shachtman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-281COMPLAINT against GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8009333) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons GSA, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/4/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/3/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-075STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 7, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-02-036NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E.T. Roberts on behalf of GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Roberts, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-037ANSWER to Complaint by GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Roberts, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-04MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by March 5, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiffs' requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiffs' requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 4, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar