Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROTH et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03838
Date Filed2020-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffFRIMET ROTH
PlaintiffARNOLD ROTH
Case DescriptionFrimet and Arnold Roth submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the extradition request to Jordan to extradite Ahlam Tamimi to the U.S. to stand charges stemming from her terrorist attack against Israel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Roths filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-291COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8013858) filed by FRIMET ROTH, ARNOLD ROTH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to gbrenner@proskauer.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-292REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for Summons for DOS re Notice of QC- New Case,, filed by FRIMET ROTH, ARNOLD ROTH. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for AG, # 2 Summons for USAO)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to gbrenner@proskauer.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-313MOTION for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1 by ARNOLD ROTH, FRIMET ROTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-31Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-314SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of plaintiffs' 3 motion for waiver, it is hereby ORDERED that the requirement of Local Civil Rules 5.1(c)(1) and 11.1 that the "full residence address of the party" be included in the caption of the initial pleading is hereby waived. It is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs file UNDER SEAL a list containing the names and residence addresses of all plaintiffs by February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-065SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ARNOLD ROTH, FRIMET ROTH(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-126MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregg M. Mashberg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065409. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ARNOLD ROTH, FRIMET ROTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregg M. Mashberg, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-127MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ziporah Reich, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065495. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ARNOLD ROTH, FRIMET ROTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ziporah Reich, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-128MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter Fishkind, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8065520. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ARNOLD ROTH, FRIMET ROTH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Fishkind, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brenner, Guy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-12MINUTE ORDER granting 6 7 8 Motions for Leave Gregg M. Mashberg, Ziporah Reich, and Peter Fishkind to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that each lawyer admitted, or at least one member of each lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/12/21. (DMK) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar