Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVidal-Martinez et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv07772
Date Filed2020-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Matthew F. Kennelly
PlaintiffJesus Vidal-Martinez
Case DescriptionJesus Vidal Martinez, who was detained in Indiana awaiting deportation, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning agency staff involved in his detention. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Vidal Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-291COMPLAINT filed by Jesus Vidal-Martinez; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17784349. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-292ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jesus Vidal-Martinez by Christopher Paul Elmore (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-303ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jesus Vidal-Martinez by Jacob S. Briskman (Briskman, Jacob) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-04SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (mxo, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar