Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePorschatis v. McDonald et al
DistrictDistrict of Utah
CityCentral
Case Number2:2020cv00913
Date Filed2020-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dale A. Kimball
PlaintiffSteven Porschatis
Case DescriptionSteven Porschatis submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning for a Compensation and Pension Exam pertaining to his veterans' benefits. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Porschatis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantRobert McDonald Secretary of the Dept. of Veteran Affairs
DefendantLeigh A. Bradley General Counsel of the Dept. of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-291COMPLAINT against Leigh A. Bradley, Robert McDonald (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 4681092835). Filed by Steven Porschatis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - FOIA Appeal, # 3 Exhibit C - Certified Mail Receipts, # 4 Exhibit D - Fax Transmission Report, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. (dw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-292**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued as to Leigh A. Bradley. (dw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-293**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued as to Robert McDonald. (dw) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-044ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/4/2021. (eat) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar