Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGonzalez v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2021cv20002
Date Filed2021-01-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge K. Michael Moore
PlaintiffJoey D Gonzalez
Case DescriptionJoey Gonzalez submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the release of his personal information by the Department of Agriculture in a lawsuit he brought against ADR Vantage. Gonzalez also submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning two USDA employees. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Gonzalez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDOJ
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of Agriculture
Departmental FOIA Officer
1400 Independence Avenue, SW
South Building, Room 4104
Washington, DC 20250-0706
DefendantU.S. Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-021COMPLAINT against DOJ, U.S. Department of Agriculture. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14140879, filed by Joey D Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Summons USDOJ, # 3 Summon(s) Summons USDA, # 4 Exhibit A - USDOJ FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit B - USDA First FOIA Request, # 6 Exhibit C - USDA Second FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit D - USDA FOIA Appeal)(Gonzalez Ramos, Joey) (Entered: 01/02/2021)
2021-01-022Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-043Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice. (kpe) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-154PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law regarding all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/15/2021. (hwr) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar