Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLASHERAS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2021cv00580
Date Filed2021-01-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Claire C. Cecchi
PlaintiffJOHN CRAVO LASHERAS
Case DescriptionJohn Lasheras submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his request to the FBI to conduct an investigation of his wife's alleged sex trafficking on Facebook and Plantir Technologies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Lasheras that they had not conducted the requested investigation. Lasheras then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-121Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 Marshall Forms, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Envelope)(bt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-142Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (bt, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-263APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JOHN CRAVO LASHERAS. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 USM 285 Form, # 3 Envelope)(bt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2021: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (bt, ). (Entered: 01/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar