Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRich v. Office of Biometric Identity Management et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2021cv00038
Date Filed2021-01-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas S. Zilly
PlaintiffKatherine Honor Rich
Case DescriptionKatherine Rich, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Biometric Identity, a component of the Department of Homeland Security, for records concerning her client. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rich filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Biometric Identity Management
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6870140) Attorney Katherine H Rich added to party Katherine Honor Rich(pty:pla), filed by Katherine Honor Rich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Rich, Katherine) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-15Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-152Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-223ORDER: To facilitate entry of an appropriate scheduling order in this matter, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and Local Civil Rule 16, counsel are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by March 22, 2021. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve copies of this Order on all parties who appear after this Order is filed, within fourteen (14) days of receipt of service of each appearance. Plaintiff's counsel will be responsible for starting the communications needed to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar