Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00122
Date Filed2021-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning communications from the Trump administration pertaining to the collection of covid-19 information by race, ethnicity, or socioeconomic status. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8078002) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-143SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-154STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 1/21/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/25/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/22/2021. (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-02-226ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-227NOTICE of Defendants' Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar