Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAERSK LINE, LIMITED v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00125
Date Filed2021-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffMAERSK LINE, LIMITED
Case DescriptionMaersk Line, Limited submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning requests for foreign flag waivers for General Services Administration Household Good Tender of Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but did not respond until 99 days later invoking unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Maersk Line filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-141COMPLAINT against MAERSK LINE, LIMITED ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8079666) filed by MAERSK LINE, LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, # 10 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, # 11 Summons Summons in a Civil Action)(Benjamin, Myra) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MAERSK LINE, LIMITED (Benjamin, Myra) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-264ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Service by MAERSK LINE, LIMITED re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Service, # 2 Supplement U.S. Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt, # 3 Supplement U.S. Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt)(Benjamin, Myra) Modified on 1/29/2021 (eg). (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 Notice (Other), was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using correct Summons Returned Executed event. (eg) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/22/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/22/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2021.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipts)(Benjamin, Myra) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-166MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gary Emery English, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8205601. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MAERSK LINE, LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Gary Emery English, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Myra) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-17MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gary Emery English is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/17/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-227NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-228ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-239MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 9, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/23/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-2610NOTICE of Appearance by Gary English on behalf of MAERSK LINE, LIMITED (English, Gary) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 4, 2021, which updates the court on the status of processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/10/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar