Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUtah Physicians for a Healthy Environment v. Federal Rail Administration
DistrictDistrict of Utah
CityCentral
Case Number2:2021cv00026
Date Filed2021-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Bruce S. Jenkins
PlaintiffUtah Physicians for a Healthy Environment UPHE
DefendantFederal Rail Administration FRA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-141Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Plaintiff Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-142COMPLAINT against Federal Rail Administration (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3877229) filed by Utah Physicians for a Healthy Environment. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Ban, Joel) Modified on 1/14/2021 by correcting who was being filed against (jl). (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-143Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint filed against wrong party. Correction: Changed docket text to show who complaint filed against. re 2 Complaint. (jl) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-144**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Rail Administration. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-145**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-02-056Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Federal Rail Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Tiffany M. Romney added to party Federal Rail Administration(pty:dft)(Romney, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-057ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Federal Rail Administration answer due 3/22/2021. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 02/05/2021. (kpf) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar