Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY v. US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00134
Date Filed2021-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY (a District of Columbia non-profit organization)
Case DescriptionThe Center for Democracy and Technology submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the monitoring of social media by U.S. Customs and Border Protection and by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, CDT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Choice of format

Defendant2255
US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
245 Murray Lane SW
Washington, DC 20528
2255
US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
1300 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20229
2255
US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
20 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20008
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUS CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUS CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-151COMPLAINT against US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8085115) filed by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Gossett, David) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-19NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to DavidGossett@dwt.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-192CIVIL COVER SHEET by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY re 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY.(Gossett, David) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-193SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-274ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/2021. (DM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-02-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 2/4/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service USPS confirmation of delivery)(Gossett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 2/4/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service USPS confirmation of delivery)(Gossett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/4/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service USPS confirmation of delivery)(Gossett, David) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-098ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service USPS confirmation of delivery)(Gossett, David) Modified on 2/10/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-099ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 1/27/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 2/17/2021. (Gossett, David) Modified on 2/10/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-0910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/27/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/26/2021.) (Attachments: # 1 Service for Attorney General)(ztd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, 8 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and refiled said pleadings using the correct events at docket entry no. 10 . (ztd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-1211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/27/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/26/2021. (Gossett, David) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1812NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-1813Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-1914ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 19, 2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/11/2021. (dot) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar