Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00166
Date Filed2021-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case DescriptionThe Brady Center for Gun Violence submitted two FOIA requests for records. The first request asked for records concerning standard operating procedures for the National Instant Criminal Background Check System. The second request asked for records concerning the impact of the pandemic on the ability to conduct background checks for gun purchases. The agency acknowledged both requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Brady Center for Gun Violence filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-191COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8093288) filed by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Loiseau, Holly) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-192SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-253NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-264NOTICE of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-02-185WAIVER OF SERVICE. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/11/2021. (Loiseau, Holly) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar