Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWest v. Village of Washington Park et al
DistrictSouthern District of Illinois
CityEast St. Louis
Case Number3:2021cv00080
Date Filed2021-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Reona J. Daly
PlaintiffTimothy West
Case DescriptionTimothy West filed suit against the Village of Washington Park alleging a violation of the Illinois Open Meetings Act. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantVillage of Washington Park an Illinois home rule municipality
DefendantRickie Thomas
DefendantMary McKinney
DefendantJuliette Gosa
DefendantJames Madkins
DefendantFerris E. Williams
DefendantDebbie Ann Moore
DefendantClyde Jackson
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4381308.), filed by Timothy West. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Gosa, # 3 Summons Jackson, # 4 Summons Madkins, # 5 Summons McKinney, # 6 Summons Moore, # 7 Summons Thomas, # 8 Summons Washington Park, # 9 Summons Williams)(Cueto, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-202NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Timothy West. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf . All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-80-RJD. Consent due by 2/10/2021 (kek) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-203NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Lloyd Cueto does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-204NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd M. Cueto on behalf of Timothy West (Cueto, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-215Summonses Issued as to Village of Washington Park, Rickie Thomas, Mary McKinney, Juliette Gosa, James Madkins, Ferris E. Williams, Debbie Ann Moore, and Clyde Jackson and originals mailed to Attorney Cueto. (kek) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-02-116NOTICE: Timothy West was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Timothy West shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 2/18/2021 (kek) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-177CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cueto, Lloyd) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-228ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Meinders, Blake) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-239NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Blake Meinders does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-2310NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing All Defendants to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to All Defendants on 2/23/2021. Consent due by 3/16/2021 (kek) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar