Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Diennet Pharmacy et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv00533
Date Filed2021-01-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christina A. Snyder
PlaintiffThe Diennet Pharmacy
PlaintiffDr Marcel Diennet
Case DescriptionThe Diennet Pharmacy submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning Dr. Marcel Diennet or the Diennet Pharmacy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Diennet Pharmacy filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy acknowledged receipt of the appeal. Diennet Pharmacy asked OIP to order DEA to disclose records on a rolling basis. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Diennet Pharmacy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-201COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30139428 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs The Diennet Pharmacy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint) (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party The Diennet Pharmacy(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-202CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Marcel Diennet, The Diennet Pharmacy. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-203NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Marcel Diennet, The Diennet Pharmacy, (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Marcel Diennet(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-204Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Marcel Diennet, The Diennet Pharmacy. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-205Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Marcel Diennet, The Diennet Pharmacy. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-216NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-217NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-21830 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Justice. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-21930 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. (et) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-2810Proof of service of summons and complaint filed by Plaintiff The Diennet Pharmacy (Attachments: # 1 Signed proof of service of summons and complaint on Defendants)(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-02-0111NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-1712STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Drug Enforcement Administration answer now due 3/28/2021; United States Department of Justice answer now due 3/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants Drug Enforcement Administration; United States Department of Justice.(Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party Drug Enforcement Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar