Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBlevins v. Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2021cv00073
Date Filed2021-01-20
Date Closed2021-02-02
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffShondolyn R Blevins
Case DescriptionShondolyn Blevins, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning his trial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Blevins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantBureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms and Explosives
DefendantUnited States Attorney's Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [6]
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-201MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L Peterson, filed by Shondolyn R Blevins. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(CDA) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-213LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. -NOTE: Enclosed is the form JS-44 Civil Cover sheet. Please complete the form and return it to the Clerk's Office as soon as possible.- (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-214ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court recommends the complaint be reviewed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-225COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Shondolyn R Blevins. (LH) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-02-026ORDER DISMISSING ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915(E)(2)(B) with leave to amend within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar