Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOram v. Wilkie et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2021cv00075
Date Filed2021-01-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffCyril David Daniel Oram, Jr
Case DescriptionCyril Oram submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records about his veterans' benefits. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Oram filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantRobert Wilkie Secretary of the Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantWilliam A Hudson, Jr General Counsel of the Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Opinion/Order [5]
Opinion/Order [10]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-201APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Cyril David Daniel Oram, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2, # 5 Exhibit A3, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Summons Wilkie, # 10 Summons Hudson, # 11 Summons AUSA, # 12 Summons Attorney General, # 13 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-212LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate. Filer has until 2/22/2021 to correct NOTE: The Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and the Complaint need correct signatures (not typed signatures). Enclosed are the pages to sign from both documents. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-264CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Cyril David Daniel Oram, Jr. (PM) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-265ORDER granting Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. However, the Court recommends the complaint be reviewed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) before issuance of summons. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-266COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against defendant(s) William A Hudson, Jr, Robert Wilkie (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Cyril David Daniel Oram, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D) (PM) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-267Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) William A Hudson, Jr, Robert Wilkie (Attachments: # 1 Summons Robert Wilkie, # 2 Summons William A Hudson, Jr, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons AUSA, # 5 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)(PM) cc: Letter, Summons, Pro Se Instruction Sheet sent to Plaintiff via USPS (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-02-018NOTICE: Plaintiff Cyril David Daniel Oram, Jr has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-019Unopposed MOTION to Amend Order dated Jan 26, 2021 (Dkt #5) , filed by Plaintiff Cyril David Daniel Oram, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Amended Order Proposal) Noting Date 2/1/2021, (Oram, Cyril) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0110ORDER granting Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Service of Summonses by USMO. DIRECTING SERVICE Packet with documents to be served on Robert Wilkie, William A Hudson, Jr., U.S. Attorney WDWA, U.S. Attorney General. Documents hand delivered to the US Marshal's Office on 2/1/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0411RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Service of Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney, Seattle on 2/2/2021. (PM) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar