Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIEDMAN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00196
Date Filed2021-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffRON FRIEDMAN
Case DescriptionRon Friedman submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the revocation of his Global Entry/Trusted Traveler Program membership. The agency acknowledged of the request and denied the request entirely. Friedman filed an administrative appeal. The agency sided with Friedman but told him that some portions of the records would still be redacted under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friedman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8109782) filed by RON FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Boss, L.) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-22Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-22NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bboss@cozen.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Please use the FOIA summons found on the court's website. https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/Summons-FOIA_2013_FILL.pdf (zsb, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-222REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RON FRIEDMAN.(Boss, L.) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-223SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(eg) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-254STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 25, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar