Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCALCUTT et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00197
Date Filed2021-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDANA MADSEN CALCUTT
PlaintiffMICHAEL CALCUTT
Case DescriptionDana Madsen Calcutt and Michael Calcutt submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the death of Colin Madsen in Russia in 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Calcutts filed suit
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8110711) filed by DANA MADSEN CALCUTT, MICHAEL CALCUTT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Fayhee, Ryan) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-22Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-273ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/2021. (DM) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar