Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDIAZ ROSADO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00227
Date Filed2021-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJOSE DIAZ ROSADO
Case DescriptionJose Diaz Rosado, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his cooperation agreement as a confidential source. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rosado filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantROBERT M. WILKINSON in his official capacity as U.S. Secretary of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8123728) filed by JOSE DIAZ ROSADO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Department of Justice, # 3 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Vissepo Garriga, Jean) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-26Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-262SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROBERT M. WILKINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-02-243ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/11/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/13/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Service of the U.S. Department of Justice, # 2 Certificate of Service Service on the U.S. Attorney General)(Vissepo Garriga, Jean) Modified on 2/26/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-26NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the Federal Defendants only. Summons have not been issued for the U.S. Attorney for D.C.(zjf) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar