Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAsch v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2021cv00084
Date Filed2021-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Robert J. Jonker
PlaintiffMarc Aaron Asch
Case DescriptionMarc Aaron Asch, an immigration attorney, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning his clients. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Asch finally filed a pattern and practice suit against the agency.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marc Aaron Asch (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-26FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Marc Aaron Asch in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6247046 (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-262PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter re Proposed Summons) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-273PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Clerk re Proposed Summonses) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-274NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (pjw) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-275SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pjw) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-276MOTION to amend/correct 5 summons by plaintiff Marc Aaron Asch; (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-277CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to amend/correct 5 summons 6 filed by Marc Aaron Asch (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-288ORDER denying 6 motion to amend/correct; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-02-099SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (Asch, Marc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar