Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv00702
Date Filed2021-01-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning various companies and organizations related to nursing homes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantCenters for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-261COMPLAINT against Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23691337)Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-262CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-263RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-264REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-265NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Settelmayer on behalf of The New York Times Company..(Settelmayer, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-27CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-27Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-27Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-276ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services..(pc) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-287NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar