Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION v. U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00244
Date Filed2021-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe National Wildlife Federation submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning an Agency Technical Review Summary Report for the Pearl River Watershed. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 5 (privileges). NWF filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NWF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Segregability - Disclosure of all non-exempt records, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8129822) filed by NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Rumelt, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-293STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 29, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar