Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00250
Date Filed2021-01-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the Adelanto detention center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-271COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8131643) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons ICE, # 11 Summons Attorney General, # 12 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-28Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-02-013ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/01/2021. (DM) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-014LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/8/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/10/2021. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/15/2021)
2021-02-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/8/21. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/15/2021)
2021-02-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 2/8/2021 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/15/2021)
2021-02-178NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar