Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityCamden
Case Number1:2021cv01342
Date Filed2021-01-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Noel L. Hillman
PlaintiffNICHOLAS KYLE MARTINO
Case DescriptionNicholas Kyle Martino submitted a FOIA request to the FBI and U.S. Marshals Service for records concerning the agencies surveillance of him. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Martino filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-281Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 COVER LETTER, # 2 Application IFP, # 3 ENVELOPE)(pr, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-292ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP Application; Directing the clerk to file the complaint and the USM serve a copy of the complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/29/2021. (pr,n.m) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-29COMPLAINT 1 against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by NICHOLAS KYLE MARTINO.(pr, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-293CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. 3 285 Forms sent to Plaintiff. (pr, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-174CERTIFICATE of USMS, 285 form returned (tf, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-175SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (tf, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar