Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBlixseth v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityReno
Case Number3:2021cv00067
Date Filed2021-01-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Miranda M. Du
PlaintiffTimothy L. Blixseth
Case DescriptionTimothy Blixseth submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning him and his company. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, Blixseth filed a complaint with the Office of Government Information Services. Blixseth submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself and his company. The agency acknowledged of the request and told Blixseth that it had searched for records but found no responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Blixseth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-291COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6351037) by Timothy L. Blixseth. Proof of service due by 4/29/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet, # 17 Summons) (Williamson, Richard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-292NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:20-cv-00101 by Plaintiff Timothy L. Blixseth. (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-293CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy L. Blixseth. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-294MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Norrett Himes and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard D. Williamson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6351058) by Plaintiff Timothy L. Blixseth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-01Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-015STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-016NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 4 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. The Verified Petition is not on the form provided by the Clerk. While LR IA 11-1 allows a petitioner to submit a Verified Petition that is not on the Court's form, it must comply with all the requirements of the Local Rule. The Verified Petition as submitted does not comply with LR IA 11-3(d), lacking the section where the party appoints local counsel. Attorney Lisa Norrett Himes is to resubmit the Verified Petition with a section appointing local counsel that is signed by her client. She is further advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link the corrected image to ECF No. 4 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. (no image attached) (PAV) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-017SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation re ECF No. 1 Complaint. (KR) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-018AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 1 Complaint,, 7 Summons Issued as to USA by Plaintiff Timothy L. Blixseth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Receipts) (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-059NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 4 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Timothy L. Blixseth. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-0810ORDER APPROVING ECF No. 4 / 9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa Norrett Hines for Plaintiff Timothy L. Blixseth, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard D. Williamson. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/8/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-0911SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy L. Blixseth re 7 Summons Issued as to USA. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 2/2/2021. (Williamson, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar