Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBattle-El v. T Mobile
DistrictNorthern District of Alabama
CityNorthwestern
Case Number3:2021cv00164
Date Filed2021-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Madeline Hughes Haikala
PlaintiffKaral Hasani Efia Battle-El
Case DescriptionKaral Hasani Efia Battle-El submitted three requests to T Mobile for records. When the company did not respond, he filed suit. This not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantT Mobile
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-021COMPLAINT against T Mobile, filed by Karal Hasani Efia Battle-El.(KEK) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-022MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karal Hasani Efia Battle-El. (KEK) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-023MOTION to Effect Service of Summons by Karal Hasani Efia Battle-El. (KEK) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-034ORDER - Mr. Battle-El has applied to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. 2 ). The Court finds Mr. Battle-El is indigent and the application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/3/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar