Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEWMAN v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00307
Date Filed2021-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJOHN NEWMAN
Case DescriptionJohn Newman, a political science professor at James Madison University, specializing in the Presidency of John F. Kennedy, submitted FOIA requests to the Drug Enforcement Administration, the FBI, and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning Cuban exile Manuel Antonio Carlos Veciana Blanche. Newman also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DEA told Newman that it believed any responsive records would be held by EOUSA. Newman filed an administrative appeal of that decision to the Office of Information Policy. OIP remanded the request to DEA to conduct a search. The FBI told Newman it found no responsive records. Newman filed an administrative appeal to OIP. EOUSA failed to respond. Newman then filed suit against all three agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-021COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8154847) filed by JOHN NEWMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Drug Enforcement Administration, # 5 Summons Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys, # 6 Summons Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Hardway, Dan) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-03Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-032SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-033STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/3/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-134REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHN NEWMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Hardway, Dan) (Entered: 02/13/2021)
2021-02-185SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (eg) (zeg). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 2/12/2021 (Hardway, Dan) (Entered: 02/20/2021)
2021-02-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/19/2021. (Hardway, Dan) (Entered: 02/27/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar