Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNo More Deaths et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv00954
Date Filed2021-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John P. Cronan
PlaintiffNo More Deaths
PlaintiffCenter for Constitutional Rights
Case DescriptionNo More Deaths and the Center for Constitutional Rights submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning CBP's Joint Intelligence Operations Center and the agency's BORSTAR unit. The requesters also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, No More Deaths and the Center for Constitutional Rights filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-031COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806328)Document filed by No More Deaths, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Guisado, Angelo) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guisado, Angelo) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-033FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, No More Deaths..(Guisado, Angelo) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-04***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Angelo Romans-Taylor Guisado to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the standard summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-044REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, No More Deaths..(Guisado, Angelo) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-055ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection..(dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-096ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed three pages, providing (1) a brief description of the materials sought by Plaintiffs, the basis for seeking the materials, and the status of any productions already made; (2) a brief description of any claim exemptions from production by Defendant; (3) an anticipated timeline for production of further materials; and (4) whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need for discovery or an initial conference, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiffs shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/9/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-167AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by No More Deaths; Center for Constitutional Rights..(Guisado, Angelo) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-178NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-189CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Letter addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Lucas Issacharoff dated 2/18/2021. Document filed by United States Customs and Border Protection..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-1810ORDER: granting 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's request is GRANTED. The parties shall have until March 25, 2021 to submit their joint letter. (See Dkt. 6.). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/18/2021) (ama) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar