Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGILBERT v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00318
Date Filed2021-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffLORI C. GILBERT
Case DescriptionLori Gilbert, an Air Force major, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning the Commander-Directed investigation of her. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency sent a final response memorandum to Gilbert telling her that it had reviewed 1807 pages and was withholding some records. Gilbert filed an administrative appeal of the decision but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gilbert filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-041COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8162226) filed by LORI C. GILBERT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Air Force, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-042Standing Order. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 4, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-184NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES AIR FORCE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-185NOTICE of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by UNITED STATES AIR FORCE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar