Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS Right to Know v. United States Food & Drug Administration et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv00884
Date Filed2021-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffUS Right to Know
Case DescriptionUS Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning communications involving a specific set of FDA employees and a specific set of keywords, including Wuhan Institute of Virology. USRTK also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, USRTK filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Food & Drug Administration
DefendantUnited States Department of Health & Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants. [Filing fee of $402.00 paid, Receipt # 0971-15533876] Filed by US Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) Modified on 2/4/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-042Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-043Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-044Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-045Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-046Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/4/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-047Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-058Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health & Human Services, United States Food & Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-05Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. The Correct Event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures [err101] Correcte d by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 6 Statement filed by US Right to Know (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-059Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-0910CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Right to Know.. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-1811SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. All Defendants. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-2312Certificate of Interested Entities by US Right to Know (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-24Electronic filing error . REMINDER : Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:221-cv-00884 KAW. [err102] Re: 12 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by US Right to Know (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar