Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. UNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00333
Date Filed2021-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Law and Justice submitted FOIA requests to the National Security Agency, the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, and the Department of State for records concerning the alleged Chinese spy Christine Fang and her alleged relationship with Rep. Eric Swalwell. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8169562) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F to Complaint, # 7 Summons To US Attorney for DC, # 8 Summons To Def. NSA, # 9 Summons To Def. ODNI)(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-052NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-053LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bsisney@aclj.org, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-084CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE.(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-08Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-085SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE,and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-096REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE.(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-097NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Roth on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-09NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to bsisney@aclj.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-108REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE.(Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-129SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(ztd) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1210SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (ztd) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1211ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/12/2021. (DM) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2021. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-2513RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/25/2021. (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar