Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMegan Guzman v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictCentral District of California
CitySouthern Division - Santa Ana
Case Number8:2021cv00263
Date Filed2021-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Josephine L. Staton
PlaintiffMegan Guzman
Case DescriptionMegan Guzman, an immigration attorney, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning her client's A-File. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Guzman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-091COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30473875 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Megan Guzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - USCIS Acknowledgement Letter) (Attorney Megan Nicole Guzman added to party Megan Guzman(pty:pla))(Guzman, Megan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Megan Guzman. (Guzman, Megan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-093NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Megan Guzman, identifying Chien-Pang Lu. (Guzman, Megan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-094Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Megan Guzman. (Guzman, Megan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-105NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-106NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-10730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ghap) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-118INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-199PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Megan Guzman, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Childress, Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt - US Attorney, # 2 Certified Mail Receipts)(Guzman, Megan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-2410STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer now due 4/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Ryan Casey Chapman added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar