Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Transparency Project v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictEastern District of Texas
CitySherman
Case Number4:2021cv00121
Date Filed2021-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Sean D. Jordan
PlaintiffThe Transparency Project
Case DescriptionThe Transparency Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the National Security Agency, the FBI, the CIA, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning surveillance of journalist Sharyl Attkisson, as well as surveillance practices during the Obama administration. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Transparency Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8241052.), filed by The Transparency Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1(Attkisson FOIA), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Surveillance FOIA), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Petraeus FOIA), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Data storage FOIA), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Updated Attkisson FOIA))(Clevenger, Ty) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2021: # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (las, ). (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-09Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (las) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-09In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (las, ) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-112Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(rpc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-113Summons Issued as to National Security Agency (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-114Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-115Summons Issued as to Central Intelligence Agency (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-116Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar