Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleClergy and Laity United for Economic Justice et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv01214
Date Filed2021-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dean D. Pregerson
PlaintiffClergy and Laity United for Economic Justice
PlaintiffEl Rescate
PlaintiffAmnesty International USA
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
PlaintiffAldea The Peoples Justice Center
PlaintiffAlianza Americas
PlaintiffImmigrants Rights Clinic at Columbia Law School
PlaintiffGeographies of Displacement University of Texas at Austin and El Colegio De Sonora
PlaintiffImmigrant Justice Task Force
PlaintiffInterfaith Community for Detained Immigrants
PlaintiffCalifornia League of United Latin American Citizens
PlaintiffLegal Services for Prisoners with Children
PlaintiffNo More Deaths
PlaintiffProject Lifeline
PlaintiffProyecto Dilley
PlaintiffPublic Law Center
PlaintiffRefugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services
PlaintiffUncage and Reunite Families Coalition
PlaintiffWitness at the Border
Case DescriptionClergy and Laity United for Economic Justice and a number of immigration advocacy groups submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning family detention centers, juvenile detention centers, and locations where parole or credible fear determination records are located. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the organizations filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice and the other immigration advocacy groups filed suit.
Complaint issues: Fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-101COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30495118 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint) (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-102Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-103Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-104Civil cover sheet filed by Plaintiffs Aldea The Peoples Justice Center, Alianza Americas, Amnesty International USA, California League of United Latin American Citizens, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, El Rescate, Geographies of Displacement University of Texas at Austin, Human Rights Watch, Immigrant Justice Task Force, Wellington Avenue United Church of Christ, Immigrants Rights Clinic Columbia Law School, Interfaith Community for Detained Immigrants, Legal Services for Prisoners with Children, No More Deaths, Project Lifeline, Proyecto Dilley, Public Law Center, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Uncage & Reunite Families Coalition, Witness at the Border re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-105Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Aldea The Peoples Justice Center, Alianza Americas, Amnesty International USA, California League of United Latin American Citizens, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, El Rescate, Geographies of Displacement University of Texas at Austin, Human Rights Watch, Immigrant Justice Task Force, Wellington Avenue United Church of Christ, Immigrants Rights Clinic Columbia Law School, Interfaith Community for Detained Immigrants, Legal Services for Prisoners with Children, No More Deaths, Project Lifeline, Proyecto Dilley, Public Law Center, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Uncage & Reunite Families Coalition, Witness at the Border re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-116NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-117NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-11830 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-11930 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1110NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas Smith on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1111NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jose Angel Gutierrez on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1112NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bridget Cambria on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1113NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document,,, 4 , Miscellaneous Document, 5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) and Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1614ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:85-cv-04544-DMG-AGRx (aco) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar