Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv01065
Date Filed2021-02-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies
Case DescriptionThe Center for Gender and Refugee Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning individuals seeking asylum based on gender-based persecution in their own country. The Center also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. ICE invoked a ten-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Gender and Refugee Studies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-111COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filed byCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-112Proposed Summons. (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-113Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-124Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-125Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-196CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies.. (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-257Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar