Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUNITED COMMUNITIES, LLC v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00394
Date Filed2021-02-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffUNITED COMMUNITIES, LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Putnam submitted three FOIA requests in 2017 on behalf of United Communities submitted to the Department of Defense for records concerning basic allowance for housing for military bases in New Jersey and Pennsylvania. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but withheld records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Pillsbury filed administrative appeals of all three responses. In November 2020, the law firm of Smith Currie & Hancock submitted a FOIA request on behalf of United Communities to the Department of Defense for records concerning basic allowance for housing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, United Communities filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8195820) filed by UNITED COMMUNITIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Carpenter, Sarah) (Attachment 12 replaced on 2/17/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNITED COMMUNITIES, LLC (Carpenter, Sarah) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar